Global Patent Index - EP 0703050 B1

EP 0703050 B1 2000-11-29 - Saws

Title (en)

Saws

Title (de)

Sägen

Title (fr)

Scies

Publication

EP 0703050 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95306726 A

Priority

GB 9419261 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0703050A1] A saw comprises a blade (10) having a working portion bonded to the periphery thereof and presenting a working surface (22), the working portion comprising a plurality of segments (12) bonded to the periphery of the blade and presenting a working surface (22), the working portion comprising a bonding matrix and having one or more elongate cutting elements (14) so located therein as to present cutting points or edges in the working surface (22). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28D 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/121 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0703050 A1 19960327; EP 0703050 B1 20001129; AU 3175695 A 19960404; AU 691641 B2 19980521; GB 9419261 D0 19941109; ZA 9507791 B 19960409

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070922

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060922

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060922

2007-05-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060923

2005-09-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050906

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050823

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DK FR GB IT SE

2000-11-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CLARK, IAN ERIC

2000-11-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WILSON, STUART MARTIN

2000-11-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TOMLINSON, PETER NOEL

2000-11-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHAFTO, GEORGE RICHARD

2000-11-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MACKENZIE, KENNETH ALEXANDER

2000-07-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DE BEERS INDUSTRIAL DIAMOND DIVISION (PROPRIETARY)

1998-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980626

1996-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960318

1996-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DK FR GB IT SE