Global patent index - EP 0703182 B1

EP 0703182 B1 2001-04-04 - Energy saving device for an elevator

Title (en)

Energy saving device for an elevator

Title (de)

Energiesparvorrichtung für einen Aufzug

Title (fr)

Dispositif économiseur d'énergie pour un ascenseur

Publication

EP 0703182 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95114463 A

Priority

FI 944295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0703182A2] The invention relates to a system for the supply of energy in an elevator, in which system the elevator motor (1) is fed by a frequency converter (15) comprising a rectifier (3), an inverter bridge (2) and an intermediate circuit (4,10,11) between them. A direct voltage converter (5) is used to convert a large intermediate voltage to a level suitable for a battery (6) and the elevator's braking energy is supplied into the battery (6). The battery (6) is connected to supply power to other elevator equipment (7,8,9) except the drive motor (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/00; B66B 5/02; B66B 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/34 (2006.01); B66B 1/30 (2006.01); B66B 5/02 (2006.01); B66B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/302 (2013.01); B66B 1/308 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0703182 A2 19960327; EP 0703182 A3 19961204; EP 0703182 B1 20010404; DE 69520533 D1 20010510; DE 69520533 T2 20010712; FI 112008 B 20031015; FI 944295 A0 19940916; FI 944295 A 19960317; JP H08169653 A 19960702

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150913

2015-10-07 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20150913

2015-09-14 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69520533

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090914

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100531

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080811

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080814

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69520533

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-10

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000626

1998-08-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONE CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-07-02 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17P

- Effective date: 19970131

1997-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970131

1996-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT