Global Patent Index - EP 0703289 B1

EP 0703289 B1 2001-12-12 - Process and apparatus for removing charging gases, produced during the charging of a coke oven battery with coal

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for removing charging gases, produced during the charging of a coke oven battery with coal

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entfernen der beim Füllen von Koksofenbatterien mit Kohle anfallenden Füllgase

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour éliminer les gaz de remplissage produits lors du remplissage de batteries de fours à coke avec du charbon

Publication

EP 0703289 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95114622 A

Priority

DE 4433417 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0703289A2] While a coke oven battery is being filled with coal, oven gases are removed by suction and are directed into the battery main (24). Some of the gas is sucked away through several or all filling holes (1,2,3,4) of the oven by means of filling telescopies (5,7,7,8), it is collected and transferred by means of one or several gas collector pipes and transfer telescopes into the gas collector space of a neighbouring oven. From the collector space of this oven gas is directed into the battery main.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10B 27/04; C10B 31/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/00 (2006.01); C10B 27/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10B 27/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0703289 A2 19960327; EP 0703289 A3 19960612; EP 0703289 B1 20011212; AU 3063395 A 19960404; AU 696355 B2 19980910; CA 2158615 A1 19960321; CA 2158615 C 20010327; CN 1053457 C 20000614; CN 1132235 A 19961002; CZ 290867 B6 20021113; CZ 9502361 A3 19960417; DE 4433417 C1 19960605; PL 180161 B1 20001229; PL 310516 A1 19960401

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP INDUSTRIAL SOLUTIONS AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: UHDE GMBH, 44141 DORTMUND, DE

- Document: DE 59509932

2015-11-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59509932

- Representative's name: GROSSE, SCHUMACHER, KNAUER, VON HIRSCHHAUSEN, DE

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150917

2015-10-07 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150917

2015-09-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59509932

2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140919

2015-05-05 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-07-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-04-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020325

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509932 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT SE

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSEN KRUPP ENCOKE GMBH

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990527

1996-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT SE

1996-04-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHROETER, HORST

1996-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951011

1996-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT SE