Global Patent Index - EP 0703291 B1

EP 0703291 B1 2001-12-05 - Car polish and drying agent

Title (en)

Car polish and drying agent

Title (de)

Autoglanztrocknungsmittel

Title (fr)

Agent de polissage et de séchage des voitures

Publication

EP 0703291 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95113096 A

Priority

DE 4430721 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0703291A2] Aq. compsns. for accelerating drying of automobile paintwork (after washing) contain 1-30 wt.% of a quat. ammonium salt of formula (I): (R<2>)(R<3>)N<+)<(CH2-CH(R<4>)-O)m-C(O)-R<1>)((CH2-CH(R<4>)- O)n-R<5>) (I) R<1> = 6-22C alkyl or alkenyl; R<2> = 1-4C alkyl; R<3> = 1-4C alkyl or (CH2-CHR<4>-O)pR<5>; R<4> = H or 1-4C alkyl; R<5> = H or C(O)R<1>; m, n, p = 1-6; and A = an anion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/62; C09G 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/62 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4430721 A1 19960307; AT 210177 T 20011215; EP 0703291 A2 19960327; EP 0703291 A3 19960821; EP 0703291 B1 20011205; US 5703029 A 19971230

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100821

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090822

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090821

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090821

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090729

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Effective date: 20091204

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090821

2010-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-03-31 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CLARIANT PRODUKTE DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-10-30 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090703

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-09-18 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080730

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080616

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080714

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080616

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080623

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-09-15 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-02-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

- Free text: CLARIANT GMBH#BRUENINGSTRASSE 50#65929 FRANKFURT AM MAIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH#BRUENINGSTRASSE 50#65929 FRANKFURT AM MAIN (DE)

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020221

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509901 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210177 T 20011215

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990607

1997-12-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT GMBH

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970221

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1996-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE