Global Patent Index - EP 0703298 B1

EP 0703298 B1 2002-11-20 - Method of manufacturing steels with good workability and shape stability

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing steels with good workability and shape stability

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von Stählen guter Verformbar- und Formbeständigkeit

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un acier présentant une bonne aptitude à la mise en forme et une bonne résistance à l'indentation

Publication

EP 0703298 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95401923 A

Priority

FR 9411481 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0703298A1] Mild steel sheet is made by hot rolling slab into sheet followed by cold rolling the sheet. The cold rolled sheet is then subjected to a first anneal in which the steel is recrystallised and the carbon passed into solid soln.. The recrystallisation temp. is held for a while to enable some over-ageing and the amt. of carbon dissolved in the soln. exceeds a predetermined value. The sheet is then subjected to a second anneal at a low temp. which precipitates some of the carbon in soln.. Finally, the sheet is subjected to a skin passing operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 8/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/04 (2006.01); C21D 9/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/48 (2013.01); C21D 8/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0703298 A1 19960327; EP 0703298 B1 20021120; AT 228174 T 20021215; DE 69528874 D1 20030102; DE 69528874 T2 20030717; DK 0703298 T3 20030317; ES 2187544 T3 20030616; FR 2724946 A1 19960329; FR 2724946 B1 19961213; PT 703298 E 20030331; US 5645656 A 19970708

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150823

2015-11-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151127

2015-11-05 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Document: GR 20030400627

- Effective date: 20150823

2015-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150822

2015-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150821

2015-10-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 228174 T

- Effective date: 20150822

2015-09-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-09-23 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2015-09-16 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150821

2015-09-02 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20150822

2015-09-01 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: MAXIMUM VALIDITY LIMIT REACHED

- Effective date: 20150822

2015-08-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-08-24 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20150822

2015-08-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69528874

2015-01-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-12-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140224

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140725

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140814

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20140722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20140723

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20140723

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187544 T3

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030123

2003-03-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400627

2003-03-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69528874 20030102

2002-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228174 T 20021215

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990607

1996-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960413

1996-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE