Global Patent Index - EP 0703370 B1

EP 0703370 B1 2000-03-08 - Actuator for a support element moving linearly

Title (en)

Actuator for a support element moving linearly

Title (de)

Stellantrieb für ein linear bewegbar gelagertes Bauteil

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande pour un organe linéaire

Publication

EP 0703370 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95114729 A

Priority

  • DE 9108533 U
  • EP 92109427 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0522289A1] Actuator for a rotatably or linearly movable component, where a first double-acting linear drive can be coupled to the component via a controllable coupling, and a control device is provided which controls the forward and return stroke of the linear motor and in one stroke direction of the linear drive activates the coupling for the purpose of the driving connection between linear drive and component and in the opposite stroke direction releases the coupling. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/061 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 9108533 U1 19910912; EP 0522289 A1 19930113; EP 0522289 B1 19960327; EP 0703370 A1 19960327; EP 0703370 B1 20000308

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-07-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030719

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-01-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020604

2002-06-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020628

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-06-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020604

2002-05-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020528

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010606

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-03-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 22.02.2001 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59209818 20000413

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-08 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 522289

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000308

1998-04-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980219

1996-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960607

1996-03-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 522289

1996-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE