Global Patent Index - EP 0703403 B1

EP 0703403 B1 2000-05-31 - Vehicle headlight with a complex-surface reflector

Title (en)

Vehicle headlight with a complex-surface reflector

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeugscheinwerfer mit einem eine komplexe Oberfläche aufweisenden Reflektor

Title (fr)

Phare de véhicule à réflecteur à surface complexe

Publication

EP 0703403 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95114817 A

Priority

IT TO940733 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0703403A1] A headlight (1) presenting a light source (3), a reflector (5), and a prismed lens in front of the reflector, wherein the reflector (5) picks up the source emitted light 360 DEG about the source, and wherein the source (3) is aligned with the optical axis (Ao) of the headlight; the reflector (5) presenting a complex reflecting surface (7) in turn presenting a number of different sectors (9,10,13,14,19,20,21) connected substantially seamlessly, none of which is defined by a surface of revolution, and most of which are defined by surfaces generated by translating a generating base curve - defined in a first plane - along a supporting curve defined in a second plane perpendicular to the first. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/12 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1364 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0703403 A1 19960327; EP 0703403 B1 20000531; DE 69517272 D1 20000706; DE 69517272 T2 20001130; ES 2146690 T3 20000816; IT 1266928 B1 19970121; IT TO940733 A1 19960320; IT TO940733 D0 19940920

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050921

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050921

2004-11-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040928

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-05-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030920

2003-09-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030920

2002-10-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021002

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146690 T3

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517272 20000706

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 7/00 A

2000-03-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING ITALIA SPA

1998-07-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980515

1996-07-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAGNETI MARELLI S.P.A.

1996-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960227

1996-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB