Global Patent Index - EP 0703406 B1

EP 0703406 B1 2000-05-24 - Reflector and louvre system for a ceiling lamp

Title (en)

Reflector and louvre system for a ceiling lamp

Title (de)

Reflektor- und Abschirmsystem für eine Deckenleuchte

Title (fr)

Réflecteur et système de grille pour un luminaire de plafond

Publication

EP 0703406 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95113084 A

Priority

DE 4433862 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0703406A1] The tube reflector (20) is positioned at right angles beneath the roof reflector (11) and has parabolically curved inner wall surfaces (22). At least one horizontal fluorescent lamp is between the roof reflector and the tube reflector. The tube reflector is positioned in a plate-shaped grid screen (13) which has rectangular cells (14) formed by intersecting bridge=pieces and possessing parabolically curved reflection surfaces. The tube reflector is positioned in a central recess (18) in the middle of the grid screen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 13/10; F21V 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 11/06 (2006.01); F21V 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 13/10 (2013.01); F21V 11/06 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/37 (2016.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4433862 C1 19960314; AT 193366 T 20000615; EP 0703406 A1 19960327; EP 0703406 B1 20000524

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010819

2002-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020301

2001-08-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010819

2001-08-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010819

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001016

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-08-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20000824

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-08-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20000824

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-08-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000817

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-08-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000803

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508381 20000629

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL

2000-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193366 T 20000615

2000-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 13/10 A, 7F 21V 11/06 B

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990719

1996-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960502

1996-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL