Global Patent Index - EP 0704097 B1

EP 0704097 B1 2000-02-16 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING ELECTROMAGNETIC CONSUMERS

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING ELECTROMAGNETIC CONSUMERS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUR ANSTEUERUNG EINES ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN VERBRAUCHERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE CONSOMMATEURS ELECTROMAGNETIQUES

Publication

EP 0704097 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95913053 A

Priority

  • DE 9500408 W
  • DE 4413240 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4413240A1] A process and device are disclosed for controlling an electromagnetic consumer (100), in particular an electrovalve for controlling the amount of injected fuel. An energy-storage element (145) is arranged between a half bridge and a voltage source (Ubat).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 7/18; F02D 41/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16K 31/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/20 (2006.01); H01F 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/1816 (2013.01); F02D 41/20 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2006 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2027 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2072 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4413240 A1 19951019; EP 0704097 A1 19960403; EP 0704097 B1 20000216; JP H08512436 A 19961224; US 5729422 A 19980317; WO 9528721 A1 19951026

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110324

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100331

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-11-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-03-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050325

2005-03-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050324

2004-03-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040322

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-05-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507809 20000323

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1998-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981012

1996-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960426

1996-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE