Global Patent Index - EP 0704143 B1

EP 0704143 B1 2000-09-13 - IN-THE-EAR HEARING AID WITH FLEXIBLE SEAL

Title (en)

IN-THE-EAR HEARING AID WITH FLEXIBLE SEAL

Title (de)

IM-OHR-HÖRGERÄT MIT FLEXIBLER DICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROTHESE AUDITIVE INTERNE A OBTURATION SOUPLE

Publication

EP 0704143 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95909928 A

Priority

  • EP 95909928 A
  • EP 94200961 A
  • IB 9500164 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9528066A1] The in-the-ear hearing aid (10) has a collar (30) which can form a seal in the bony part (3) of the ear canal (1), which reduces the occlusion effect. The collar (30) comprises a tubular portion (31) which is engageable against the wall (9) of the ear canal, a fixing portion (32) and a curved sealing portion (33). Owing to the use of this collar (30) it is not necessary to make a mould of the bony part (3) of the ear canal. This collar enables the hearing aid to be constructed in such a manner that it can be inserted so deep into ear canal that it is substantially invisible.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01); H04R 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/652 (2013.01); H04R 25/456 (2013.01); H04R 25/658 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9528066 A1 19951019; DE 69518807 D1 20001019; DE 69518807 T2 20010419; DK 0704143 T3 20001106; EP 0704143 A1 19960403; EP 0704143 B1 20000913; ES 2151592 T3 20010101; JP H08511412 A 19961126; US 5742692 A 19980421

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69518807

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090313

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090313

2009-11-09 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080318

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080208

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080110

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BELTONE NETHERLANDS B.V.

- Free text: BELTONE NETHERLANDS B.V.#HURKSESTRAAT 42#5652 AL EINDHOVEN (NL) -TRANSFER TO- BELTONE NETHERLANDS B.V.#HURKSESTRAAT 42#5652 AL EINDHOVEN (NL)

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030410

2004-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2002-12-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-03-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010330

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010316

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151592 T3

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2000-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69518807 20001019

2000-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-09-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BELTONE NETHERLANDS B.V.

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990824

1996-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960419

1996-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL