Global Patent Index - EP 0704252 B1

EP 0704252 B1 2000-05-03 - Handheld shower head with lever operated valve

Title (en)

Handheld shower head with lever operated valve

Title (de)

Brause mit einem Handgriff und einem mittels eines Handhebels betätigbaren Absperrorgan

Title (fr)

Pomme de douche avec poignée et soupape actionnée par levier

Publication

EP 0704252 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95113137 A

Priority

CH 294794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0704252A2] The spray head has a tubular hand grip (10), which at its inlet-side end (10a) has a connector (12) for an input conduit nd at its outlet-side end (10b) a spray head (16). Built on the hand grip or in it is a cut-off component (14), which by a hand lever (18) is operable against the force of a return spring (14j) intended for closing purposes. At least the hand grip and the hand lever are encased in an outwardly sealed rubber-elastic overcoat (20) which allows free play for the hand lever. The overcoat is at least approximately hose-shaped and prefabricated and at its ends has seals (20a,20b). Such seals on the inside of the overcoat incorporate either a ring convolution or a ring groove.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 15/00; A47L 17/00; B05B 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 17/00 (2006.01); B05B 1/30 (2006.01); B05B 3/04 (2006.01); B05B 15/00 (2006.01); B05B 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/04 (2013.01); A47L 17/00 (2013.01); B05B 1/3046 (2013.01); B05B 15/00 (2013.01); B05B 1/18 (2013.01); Y10S 239/12 (2013.01); Y10T 137/3367 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0704252 A2 19960403; EP 0704252 A3 19960619; EP 0704252 B1 20000503; AT 192359 T 20000515; CA 2159172 A1 19960330; CA 2159172 C 20000104; CH 688080 A5 19970515; DE 59508252 D1 20000608; US 5732884 A 19980331

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050822

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-08-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030822

2002-08-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020812

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020809

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-07-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020729

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DRAGOTTI & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508252 20000608

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192359 T 20000515

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990129

1996-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

1996-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960224

1996-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT