Global Patent Index - EP 0704403 B1

EP 0704403 B1 2000-06-28 - Package with curved walls

Title (en)

Package with curved walls

Title (de)

Verpackung mit gebogenen Flächen

Title (fr)

Emballage avec des faces courbes

Publication

EP 0704403 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95115215 A

Priority

DE 4435227 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4435227C1] Each box half is made from a single sheet of card or cellulose. This has four curved tags (17) along one edge as well as two tag strips (18) which are curved and secured under the tags to form the end walls of the box. The box half is formed by winding around a former and with a double skin construction.The tags are on opposite sides of each curved end to fold over each other. The curved tags have a pressed groove pattern (20) which aligns tag strips and which provides support. The two box halves are joined by sliding one half onto an insert fitted into the other box half.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 3/00; A45C 11/04; A45C 11/34; B65D 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/04 (2006.01); A45C 11/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/04 (2013.01); A45C 11/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4435227 C1 19951019; AT 194114 T 20000715; EP 0704403 A2 19960403; EP 0704403 A3 19970402; EP 0704403 B1 20000628; HU 9502856 D0 19951128; HU T72962 A 19960628; PL 103246 U1 19960415; PL 57770 Y1 20000331

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010901

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: WOHRSTEIN ROLF

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-12-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-11-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-11-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WOEHRSTEIN, ROLF

2000-11-22 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Free text: WOEHRSTEIN, ROLF

2000-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508508 20000803

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-06-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194114 T 20000715

1998-03-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980211

1997-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970925

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1997-03-19 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 3/00

1996-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL