Global Patent Index - EP 0704577 B1

EP 0704577 B1 2000-02-09 - Quick-coupling for connecting implements to an excavator

Title (en)

Quick-coupling for connecting implements to an excavator

Title (de)

Schnellkupplung zum Befestigen der Arbeitswerkzeuge an einem Baggerausleger

Title (fr)

Accouplement rapide pour la fixation d'un outil à une excavatrice

Publication

EP 0704577 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95401790 A

Priority

  • FR 9411631 A
  • FR 9506566 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0704577A1] The coupling consists of a cradle (4) on the end of the arm (1), designed to receive an axle or pivots (11) on the tool (2), and stops (12,13) on the arm and tool which engage when the tool is in position. One of the stops (12) has a concave contact surface and the other (13) a convex one, with both surfaces forming a portion of a cylinder lying coaxially with the axle or pivots (11). When the tool is picked up by the end of the arm axle or pivots engage with the cradle but the stops are separate from one another. A locking member (3) is then closed over the tool by levers (8,9) operated by a power cylinder rod (10), and the stops engage, fixing the tool in place.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/3613 (2013.01); E02F 3/364 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0704577 A1 19960403; EP 0704577 B1 20000209; AT 189726 T 20000215; DE 69514973 D1 20000316; DE 69514973 T2 20000727; DK 0704577 T3 20000724; ES 2144588 T3 20000616; FR 2725224 A1 19960405; FR 2725224 B1 19970418

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150729

2015-11-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20151104

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150727

2015-08-19 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20150727

2015-08-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-07-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69514973

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140730

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140714

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140725

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140717

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140604

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140711

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140715

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120728

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120729

2013-04-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2013-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 189726

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120728

2013-03-05 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110708

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SOCIETE A RESPONSABILITE LIMITEE : MORIN FRERES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2002-01-04 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENSES

- Ref Legal Event Code: CL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN4

2000-07-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-07-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2144588

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-04-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: D. PERROTTA & C. S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69514973

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-16

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189726

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1998-08-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980707

1996-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960116

1996-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE