Global Patent Index - EP 0704587 B1

EP 0704587 B1 2001-04-18 - Safety device for windows and doors

Title (en)

Safety device for windows and doors

Title (de)

Sicherungsvorrichtung für Fenster und Türen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité pour fenêtres et portes

Publication

EP 0704587 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95112786 A

Priority

DE 9415766 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0704587A1] The security device has a reception slot (6) for a locking bolt attached to the door or window frame, with a pressure sensor (12) within the reception slot, providing an electrical signal when the locking bolt is received. Pref. the pressure sensor is provided by a foil element secured to one wall of the reception slot, exhibiting a pressure-dependent resistance, coupled to an evaluation stage providing a locking status signal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 45/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 45/06 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01); G08B 13/08 (2006.01); E05B 67/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/0004 (2013.01); E05B 45/06 (2013.01); G08B 13/08 (2013.01); E05B 67/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 9415766 U1 19941201; AT 200700 T 20010515; EP 0704587 A1 19960403; EP 0704587 B1 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070814

2006-08-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060818

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060818

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-08-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050810

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-10-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509202 20010523

2001-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-04-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-04-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200700 T 20010515

1998-07-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980518

1996-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960725

1996-07-24 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 19960403

1996-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI