Global patent index - EP 0704600 B1

EP 0704600 B1 2000-11-15 - Method and apparatus for increasing the tunnel profile by using a tunneling advancing machine

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for increasing the tunnel profile by using a tunneling advancing machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Arbeitskopf zum Erzeugen einer Profilvergrösserung beim Einsatz von Vortriebsmaschinen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour élargir le profil d'un tunnel employant une machine à creusement

Publication

EP 0704600 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95115057 A

Priority

DE 9415897 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0704600A2] The rotatively driven work head is provided with tools for creating a circular cross-section and with at least one controlled inwards to outwards and outwards to inwards movable tool for producing a profile enlargement. The movable profile enlargement tool (15) is a back-cutting cutter roller. A holder (21) for the cutting roller on the work head (1) is radially displaceable by a controllable drive (22a,22b,23). A holder for the cutter roller is pivotable by a controllable drive around an axis on the work head. The pivot axis is provided in the front area of the work head. The holder with the cutter roller is pivotable in the direction of the front side of the work head towards the working surface (B).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21D 9/08; E21D 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21D 9/087 (2006.01); E21D 9/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21D 9/115 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 9415897 U1 19950921; AT 197630 T 20001215; EP 0704600 A2 19960403; EP 0704600 A3 19970611; EP 0704600 B1 20001115

INPADOC legal status

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080925

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070912

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070927

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-09-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060928

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060913

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-04-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-02-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010215

2000-12-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508859

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-21

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-11-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 197630

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-03-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990722

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990722

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970624

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

1996-07-24 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Ref Legal Event Code: K1C1

- Effective date: 19960403

1996-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE