Global Patent Index - EP 0704605 B1

EP 0704605 B1 2003-06-04 - Internal combustion engine with a cam phase variation apparatus

Title (en)

Internal combustion engine with a cam phase variation apparatus

Title (de)

Brennkraftmaschine mit Vorrichtung zur Verstellung der Nockenphase

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion interne avec dispositif de variation de la phase de l'arbre à cames

Publication

EP 0704605 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95115427 A

Priority

JP 26182694 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0704605A2] This invention concerns internal combustion engines comprising an engine block including a cylinder head unit attached to a cylinder block, a valve actuating mechanism including at least one camshaft, a camshaft drive mechanism including a cam sprocket associated to the camshaft, and a cam phase variation apparatus for varying the angular relation between said camshaft and cam sprocket, said cam phase variation apparatus including an operating mechanism mounted on the camshaft and a hydraulic actuation means connected with said operating mechanism. The engine has been improved in that the hydraulic actuation means forms a pre-assembled unit attached to the engine block from the outside. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/344; F01L 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/34 (2006.01); F01L 1/26 (2006.01); F01L 1/344 (2006.01); F01L 1/46 (2006.01); F01M 9/10 (2006.01); F01M 11/02 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/265 (2013.01); F01L 1/34406 (2013.01); F01M 9/102 (2013.01); F01M 11/02 (2013.01); F01L 2001/34433 (2013.01); F01M 9/108 (2013.01); F02F 7/006 (2013.01); F02F 2007/0063 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0704605 A2 19960403; EP 0704605 A3 19961127; EP 0704605 B1 20030604; DE 69530962 D1 20030710; DE 69530962 T2 20040513; JP H08100611 A 19960416

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050929

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050929

2005-09-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050929

2004-09-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040929

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040923

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040908

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69530962 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-05-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000411

1997-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970523

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-07-24 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 19960403

1996-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT