Global Patent Index - EP 0704664 B1

EP 0704664 B1 2000-11-29 - Furnace for reheating, holding and storing of metallurgical products

Title (en)

Furnace for reheating, holding and storing of metallurgical products

Title (de)

Ofen zum Wärmen, Halten und Speichern metallurgischer Produkte

Title (fr)

Four de réchauffage, de maintien et d'accumulation de produits sidérurgiques

Publication

EP 0704664 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95402131 A

Priority

FR 9411527 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0704664A1] The furnace has a storage zone with lengthwise supporting (1) and transporting (2) members, and includes at least one gp. of lengthwise supporting members which can move independently of the furnace sole in a horizontal reciprocating motion, so that a load is moved progressively by a distance equal to the sum of the distances travelled by the supporting (1) and transporting (2) members. The speed at which the prods. travel through the furnace is variable between zero - in the absence of horizontal movement of the supporting and transporting members - and a max. speed which corresponds to a combination of the speeds of both sets of members.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27B 9/20; B21B 1/46; C21D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/00 (2006.01); B21B 1/46 (2006.01); C21D 9/00 (2006.01); F27B 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/0081 (2013.01); B21B 1/466 (2013.01); F27B 9/202 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 0704664 A1 19960403; EP 0704664 B1 20001129; BR 9504193 A 19960806; CA 2159164 A1 19960328; CA 2159164 C 19991019; DE 69519502 D1 20010104; DE 69519502 T2 20010802; DE 704664 T1 19961010; ES 2084574 T1 19960516; ES 2084574 T3 20010201; FR 2725016 A1 19960329; FR 2725016 B1 19970117; JP 3799085 B2 20060719; JP H08170117 A 19960702; US 5607144 A 19970304

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080921

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *STEIN HEURTEY

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070917

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070913

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070829

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030922

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030921

2003-09-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-09-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030921

2003-09-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030921

2002-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-09-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020926

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-09-24 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020924

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-09-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020919

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2084574 T3

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519502 20010104

2001-01-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-12-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT LU

1999-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990308

1996-10-10 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1996-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960412

1996-05-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2084574 T1

1996-05-15 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1996-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT LU

1996-04-03 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.