Global Patent Index - EP 0704864 B1

EP 0704864 B1 2002-11-13 - Resistor on a ceramic circuit board

Title (en)

Resistor on a ceramic circuit board

Title (de)

Widerstand auf einer keramischen Platte

Title (fr)

Résistance sur circuit céramique

Publication

EP 0704864 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95115134 A

Priority

  • JP 23336594 A
  • JP 4972395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0704864A2] A ceramic circuit board having an external resistor prepared by co-firing a low-bubbling resistor and a glass overcoat in which Ag is used in an amount of 0 to less than 1% by weight with a glass having a deformation temperature not higher than that of the glass of the overcoat in the low-bubbling resistor and a glass of CaO-Al2O3-SiO2-B2O3 system is used in the overcoat. Also, in the low-bubbling resistor, Ag may be contained in an amount of at least 1% by weight in combination with a glass having such a deformation temperature that this deformation temperature minus 10 DEG C is not higher than that of the glass of the overcoat. Addition of Ag to the resistor can render the deformation temperature of the glass of the resistance paste substantially equal to or less than that of the glass of the overcoat, thereby enabling further reduction of the amount of bubbles remaining in the resistor after firing. The low-bubbling resistor not only enables accurate adjustment of the resistivity by laser trimming but also enables stable maintenance of the resistance value after the trimming.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01C 17/02; H01C 17/06; H01C 17/065; H01C 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05K 3/28 (2006.01); H01C 17/02 (2006.01); H01C 17/065 (2006.01); H05K 1/03 (2006.01); H05K 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01C 17/065 (2013.01); H01C 17/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0704864 A2 19960403; EP 0704864 A3 19961023; EP 0704864 B1 20021113; DE 69528802 D1 20021219; DE 69528802 T2 20030410; JP 3093601 B2 20001003; JP H08153945 A 19960611

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150925

2015-10-21 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150925

2015-09-26 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69528802

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140906

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-12-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-07-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69528802 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010730

1997-05-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUMITOMO METAL (SMI) ELECTRONICS DEVICES INC.

1996-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961029

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB