Global patent index - EP 0705489 B1

EP 0705489 B1 2000-05-17 - DEVICE FOR CONNECTING A COAXIAL CABLE TO CONTACTS WHICH CAN BE CONNECTED TO EXTENSION LEAD ARRANGEMENTS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONNECTING A COAXIAL CABLE TO CONTACTS WHICH CAN BE CONNECTED TO EXTENSION LEAD ARRANGEMENTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANSCHLIESSEN EINES KOAXIALKABELS AN MIT WEITERFÜHRENDEN LEITUNGSEINRICHTUNGEN VERBINDBARE KONTAKTE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE RACCORDEMENT D'UN CABLE COAXIAL A DES CONTACTS POUVANT ETRE RACCORDES A DES SYSTEMES PROLONGATEURS

Publication

EP 0705489 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94913107 A

Priority

EP 9401023 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5899769A] PCT No. PCT/EP94/01023 Sec. 371 Date Nov. 29, 1995 Sec. 102(e) Date Nov. 29, 1995 PCT Filed Mar. 31, 1994 PCT Pub. No. WO95/27319 PCT Pub. Date Oct. 12, 1995A device for connecting a coaxial cable to first and second contacts which are secured in an enclosure. The enclosure is equipped with an insert having an inner bore to snugly seat the coaxial cable and whose center axis is in true alignment with the first contact. The second contact includes a contact spring device circumferentially clamped in the enclosure in an essentially rigid manner and having tabs with sharp free ends extending toward a contact pin rigidly fastened in the enclosure. The tabs are bent outward at identical angles from a plane defined by the clamped position of the contact spring device toward the inner bore of the insert. The insert is equipped with a rigid thrust face for exertion of pressure against the tabs of the contact spring device. The contact spring device, the contact pin and the insert are matched to one another and located in the enclosure. The contact pin axially penetrates the inner conductors of the coaxial cable and the tabs of the contact spring device cut an outer cable insulation and press into contact with a cable shield in the coaxial cable when the coaxial cable has been cleanly cut perpendicular to its longitudinal axis and is located in the inner bore of the insert, is pushed some distance onto the contact pin and the insert is then pushed by a clamping nut over a defined distance toward the contact pin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/05; H01R 4/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/50 (2006.01); H01R 9/05 (2006.01); H01R 9/053 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/0521 (2013.01); H01R 4/5033 (2013.01); H01R 9/053 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 5899769 A 19990504; DE 59409367 D1 20000621; DE 9405994 U1 19940714; EP 0705489 A1 19960410; EP 0705489 B1 20000517; JP H08511376 A 19961126; WO 9527319 A1 19951012

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-11-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010529

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010323

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010312

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409367

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-21

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990215

1997-10-08 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19U

- Effective date: 19970426

1997-10-08 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19W

- Effective date: 19970808

1996-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19951207

1996-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB