Global Patent Index - EP 0705663 B1

EP 0705663 B1 2000-03-22 - Grinding apparatus

Title (en)

Grinding apparatus

Title (de)

Schleifvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil de meulage

Publication

EP 0705663 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95112155 A

Priority

JP 24372094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0705663A1] A pair of supporting arms 54 are rotatably attached to both ends of a fixed shaft 52. A supporting shaft 56 extends across forward ends of the supporting arms 54 in parallel to the fixed shaft 52. A grinding roller 58 on which an abrasive tape 28 is arranged, and guide rollers 60 sandwiching it are attached to this shaft 56. Axial centers of the grinding roller 58 and the guide rollers 60 are in an eccentric state. Thus when the guide rollers 60 contact a color filter 12, a gap is given between the grinding roller 58 and the color filter 12, and projections can be ground corresponding to the gap. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 21/14; B24B 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/1335 (2006.01); B24B 21/00 (2006.01); B24B 21/12 (2006.01); B24B 21/14 (2006.01); B24B 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 41/002 (2013.01); B24B 21/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0705663 A1 19960410; EP 0705663 B1 20000322; CN 1074968 C 20011121; CN 1119977 A 19960410; DE 69515779 D1 20000427; DE 69515779 T2 20000706; JP H08108359 A 19960430; KR 182854 B1 19990501; US 5584752 A 19961217

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69515779

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-03-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110301

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090709

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090729

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090816

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-04-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515779 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

1997-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970312

1996-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960315

1996-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL