Global Patent Index - EP 0705753 B1

EP 0705753 B1 2002-11-20 - Method for predeterminating running speed at light signals

Title (en)

Method for predeterminating running speed at light signals

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Vorgabe von Fahrgeschwindigkeiten an einem Lichtsignal

Title (fr)

Procédé pour prédéterminer des vitesses de déplacement à des signaux lumineux

Publication

EP 0705753 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95250212 A

Priority

DE 4434375 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0705753A2] In the signalling system, the signal provided at the beginning of a track section is dependent upon the signal provided at the end of the track section, allowing for the travel velocity restrictions within the track section and the braking characteristics of the train. The track section is divided into successive track elements (A1,A2.1,A2.,A3) of defined length and gradient, with the signal at the beginning of the track section also dependent on the sum of the track element lengths between the signals and the track section gradients.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61L 21/04; B61L 23/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 3/02 (2006.01); B61L 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 3/02 (2013.01); B61L 23/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4434375 A1 19960321; AT 228079 T 20021215; EP 0705753 A2 19960410; EP 0705753 A3 19980107; EP 0705753 B1 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-03-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-08-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030830

2003-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030829

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59510463 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR SE

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228079 T 20021215

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020215

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971204

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR SE

1996-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR SE