Global Patent Index - EP 0705805 B1

EP 0705805 B1 2001-12-05 - Sintered body of silicon nitride for use as sliding member

Title (en)

Sintered body of silicon nitride for use as sliding member

Title (de)

Siliciumnitrid-Sinterkörper zur Verwendung als Gleitlagerbauteil

Title (fr)

Corps fritté en nitrure de silicium pour l'utilisation comme palier à glissement

Publication

EP 0705805 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95114668 A

Priority

  • JP 24677894 A
  • JP 34053194 A
  • JP 15573195 A
  • JP 18264295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0705805A2] A sintered body of silicon nitride for use as a sliding member is produced by sintering a mixture of a silicon-nitride-based powder and a sintering additive, and contains a metallic compound having a contact angle of silicon nitride of a matrix and finely separated out on at least a surface of the sintered body of silicon nitride. The sintered body of silicon nitride exhibits excellent sliding characteristics in fluid-lubricated environments. The silicon-nitride-based powder preferably comprises a powder of silicon nitride and at least one metal element selected from the group consisting of molybdenum, nickel, cobalt, chromium, manganese, tungsten, and tantalum, and/or a nitride or a sulfide of such at least one metal element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C04B 35/587; C04B 35/593; F16C 33/04; C04B 35/65

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 35/593 (2006.01); F16C 33/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C04B 35/5935 (2013.01); F16C 33/043 (2013.01); F16C 33/104 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0705805 A2 19960410; EP 0705805 A3 19960911; EP 0705805 B1 20011205; DE 69524352 D1 20020117; DE 69524352 T2 20020523

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050918

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050918

2004-09-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040929

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040916

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040813

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69524352 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980907

1997-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970204

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB