Global patent index - EP 0705941 B1

EP 0705941 B1 2000-05-31 - Two piezometers pressuremeter

Title (en)

Two piezometers pressuremeter

Title (de)

Pressiometer mit zwei Piezometer

Title (fr)

Pressiomètre à deux piézomètres

Publication

EP 0705941 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94400638 A

Priority

  • EP 94400638 A
  • FR 9211210 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2696003A1] The equipment for measuring the mechanical characteristics of the ground includes dropping a membrane tube into a bore hole in the ground. A liquid is introduced under pressure into the tube, and the increase in volume of the tube is then measured as a function of the pressure exerted. A pressure sensor is dropped into the ground into a position just above the maximum deformations of the membrane tube in order to determine the interstitial pressure in the region of the probe. The pressure sensor is a piezoelectric device, and there is also a piston and hydraulic element to prevent the collapse of the tube. ADVANTAGE - Is protected against collapse of membrane tube.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 1/02; E21B 47/06; E21B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 1/02 (2006.01); E21B 47/06 (2012.01); E21B 49/00 (2006.01); G01N 33/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 49/008 (2013.01); E02D 1/022 (2013.01); E02D 1/027 (2013.01); E21B 47/06 (2013.01); E21B 49/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2696003 A1 19940325; FR 2696003 B1 19950303; EP 0705941 A1 19960410; EP 0705941 B1 20000531

INPADOC legal status

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090324

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090324

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060313

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080305

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080305

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-03-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070314

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-03-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-03-12 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070312

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69424787

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-06

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2000-05-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: TWO PIEZOMETERS PRESSUREMETER

1999-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990211

1996-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961008

1996-07-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

1996-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL