Global Patent Index - EP 0705980 B1

EP 0705980 B1 2000-03-01 - Hydraulic pumping unit

Title (en)

Hydraulic pumping unit

Title (de)

Hydroaggregat

Title (fr)

Groupe de pompage hydraulique

Publication

EP 0705980 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95112496 A

Priority

DE 4435494 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0705980A1] The connecting component (11) is connected to the pump (10) and in it is at least one channel (31,32) for a pressure medium. The connecting component channel connects the pump with a hydraulic system. The connecting component is of plastics and in it is formed at least one recess (26,27), in which is an insert part (28,29) with the channel for the pressure medium. The insert part is of metal, is tubular and is sealed to the connecting component by sealing components (33). The connecting component on the opposite side (22) to the pump is connected to a drive motor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 11/00; F04D 13/02; F04D 29/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 11/00 (2006.01); F04D 13/02 (2006.01); F04D 29/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/406 (2013.01); F04C 11/00 (2013.01); F04D 13/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0705980 A1 19960410; EP 0705980 B1 20000301; DE 4435494 A1 19960411; ES 2143567 T3 20000516

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081024

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071024

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-10-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061018

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-08-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050809

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20020911

2003-06-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2002-04-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-08-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010824

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-08-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-08-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000822

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-08-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000801

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-05-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2143567

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59507885

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-06

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-09-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980723

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961010

1996-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT