EP 0706076 A1 19960410 - Improvements relating to cameras
Title (en)
Improvements relating to cameras
Title (de)
Verbesserungen an Kameras
Title (fr)
Perfectionnements relatifs à des appareils photographiques
Publication
Application
Priority
US 31699994 A 19941003
Abstract (en)
A magnetic head (10) for a camera having a track-forming portion (26, 28) for at least reading information from a magnetic memory region of a film associated with the camera wherein the track-forming portion (26, 28) includes an improved core (44) forming a magnetic circuit and having a pair of pole pieces (46, 48) each of which is generally flat with arms extending to one side of spaced coil winding areas, the pole pieces (46, 48) being placed at a substantial angle with ends of front and rear arms of the two pole pieces (46, 48) closely opposed, the front pair of ends being spaced to form a non-magnetic gap (68). Thickness of the magnetic circuit near the gap (68) is reduced by recesses in the adjacent front arms preferably filled by non-magnetic inserts that support the narrowed arms during contouring of the ends to further define the gap depth and form a contact surface (64) for the film track. Angling of the pole pieces (46, 48) provides a low height core with coils lying parallel with the film surface but made from simple flat pole elements. Angling of the opposing ends of the rear arms increases contact area of the arm ends for improved core efficiency. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G03B 7/24 (2006.01); G03B 17/24 (2006.01); G11B 5/127 (2006.01); G11B 5/17 (2006.01); G11B 5/29 (2006.01); G11B 5/48 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
G03B 17/24 (2013.01 - EP KR US); G11B 5/127 (2013.01 - EP US); G11B 5/17 (2013.01 - EP US); G11B 5/235 (2013.01 - KR); G11B 5/29 (2013.01 - EP US); G11B 31/00 (2013.01 - KR); G03B 2217/244 (2013.01 - EP US); G11B 5/488 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (applicant)
US 24153594 A 19940512
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 4247878 A 19810127 - SHIMODA MISAO, et al
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 010 (P - 248) 18 January 1984 (1984-01-18)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 499 (P - 1289) 17 December 1991 (1991-12-17)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 424 (P - 1268) 28 October 1991 (1991-10-28)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB IT NL
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0706076 A1 19960410; JP H08194911 A 19960730; KR 960015559 A 19960522; US 5557355 A 19960917
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 95202624 A 19950929; JP 25537695 A 19951002; KR 19950033662 A 19951002; US 31699994 A 19941003