Global Patent Index - EP 0706245 B1

EP 0706245 B1 2000-06-07 - Overvoltage protection element

Title (en)

Overvoltage protection element

Title (de)

Überspannungsschutzelement

Title (fr)

Elément de protection contre les surtensions

Publication

EP 0706245 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95114840 A

Priority

  • DE 4435968 A
  • DE 4437094 A
  • DE 4439730 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0706245A2] An overvoltage protection element for diverting transient excess voltages includes two electrodes (2) with an effective air breakdown spark path (3) between them. Each electrode (2) has a connector (5) with an associated obliquely positioned arcing horn (6), with both arcing horns (6) of the mutually spaced electrodes (2) together forming the air breakdown spark path (3). A quench-plate (23) arrangement comprising at least one preferably several quenching plates (22) is provided in the housing (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01T 4/14; H01T 4/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01T 4/10 (2006.01); H01T 4/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 4/14 (2013.01); H01T 4/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0706245 A2 19960410; EP 0706245 A3 19960911; EP 0706245 B1 20000607; AT 193789 T 20000615; AT 250289 T 20031015; ES 2148390 T3 20001016; ES 2207875 T3 20040601; US 5754385 A 19980519

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150922

2015-12-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151230

2015-12-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-11-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 193789 T

- Effective date: 20150921

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150920

2015-10-14 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150920

2015-09-30 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20150920

2015-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140918

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148390 T3

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193789 T 20000615

1998-03-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980129

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970211

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1996-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR GB IT LI NL SE