Global Patent Index - EP 0706769 A3

EP 0706769 A3 2000-09-06 - Working height adjustment device for a table desktop or the like

Title (en)

Working height adjustment device for a table desktop or the like

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verstellen der Arbeitshöhe einer Tischplatte oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de réglage de la hauteur d'un plan de travail d'une table ou analogue

Publication

EP 0706769 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 95116005 A

Priority

  • DE 4436839 A
  • DE 19517825 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0706769A2] The parallel links (1,2) are attached at one end to two points (6a,6b) on the supporting frame (3). It is attached at the other end to two further such points (6c,6d) on a guide member (4) underneath the table (11) and sliding parallel to it. The table is fixed in position in the horizontal direction in relation to the frame by a further link (5) between the midpoint (5b) of one of the first links and a fixed point (5a) on the table. The first links and their guide members can be joined together by crossmembers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 9/00 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0056 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0706769 A2 19960417; EP 0706769 A3 20000906; US 5649493 A 19970722

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011221

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010510

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL SE

1996-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL SE