Global Patent Index - EP 0706772 B1

EP 0706772 B1 2000-02-16 - Clamping hanger for trousers, skirts and other textiles

Title (en)

Clamping hanger for trousers, skirts and other textiles

Title (de)

Klemmbügel für Hosen, Röcke und andere Textilien

Title (fr)

Cintre à pince pour pantalons, jupes et autres articles textiles

Publication

EP 0706772 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95116162 A

Priority

DE 9416515 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0706772A1] The two clamping strips (10,12) are joined by wire hinge stirrups (11,21) each with two arms (12,22) at right angles to the respective strip and joined by a web (13,23) with a portion (16,26) bent out towards the respective strip. The web of the first stirrup has short sections (14) either side of the bent-out portion and parallel to the strip and forming the hinge axis. That of the second stirrup has curved portions (24) joining the arms to the bent-out portion and fitting part-way round the sections of the first stirrup. The bent-out portion of the first stirrup is offset from the plane of its arms, being jointed to the hinge axis by short sections (15) at right angles to the plane of the two arms. The width of the bent-out portion of the second stirrup is reduced by short sections (25) parallel to the strip and between it and the curved portions, making it narrower than the portion (16) of the first stirrup.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 25/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/481 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 9416515 U1 19960215; AT 189765 T 20000315; EP 0706772 A1 19960417; EP 0706772 B1 20000216

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-06-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-06-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2002-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2001-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011014

2001-10-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011013

2001-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MAWA METALLWARENFABRIK WAGNER G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001108

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001031

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001023

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001023

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-13 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-10-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001013

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001006

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59507810

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-23

2000-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-02-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000216

2000-02-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189765

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990427

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961009

1996-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI LU NL SE