Global Patent Index - EP 0706798 B1

EP 0706798 B1 2001-03-28 - Pharmaceutical composition containing biologically active peptide or protein

Title (en)

Pharmaceutical composition containing biologically active peptide or protein

Title (de)

Pharmaceutische Zusammensetzung von biologisch aktiven Peptiden oder Proteinen

Title (fr)

Composition pharmaceutique contenant des peptides ou protéines biologiquement actifs

Publication

EP 0706798 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95110741 A

Priority

JP 17107094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0706798A1] There is described a pharmaceutical composition containing a biologically active substance selected from a basic peptide, protein, salt thereof and derivative thereof as well as a fat emulsion as a carrier of the biological active substance. The composition shows an increased biological activity, improved stability to a peptidase, and extended duration in pharmacological effect of the peptide, in comparison with an aqueous solution of the peptide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/107 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/22 (2006.01); A61K 38/23 (2006.01); A61K 47/12 (2006.01); A61K 47/24 (2006.01); A61K 47/28 (2006.01); C07K 14/575 (2006.01); C07K 14/585 (2006.01); C07K 14/63 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/23 (2013.01); A61K 9/0019 (2013.01); A61K 9/107 (2013.01); A61K 38/2214 (2013.01); A61K 38/2278 (2013.01); A61K 47/12 (2013.01); A61K 47/24 (2013.01); Y10S 514/938 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

  • US-A-4 340 594 & JP-56-167616 (1981)
  • EP-A-0 132 027 & JP-59-216820 (1984)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0706798 A1 19960417; EP 0706798 B1 20010328; DE 69520475 D1 20010503; DE 69520475 T2 20010927; JP H0827018 A 19960130; US 5733877 A 19980331

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050710

2006-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050710

2005-07-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050710

2004-07-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040722

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040715

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040708

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040707

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2001-05-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520475 20010503

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990902

1996-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960919

1996-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI