Global Patent Index - EP 0706838 B1

EP 0706838 B1 2000-08-09 - Machine and method for sorting varied objects using at least one robotic arm

Title (en)

Machine and method for sorting varied objects using at least one robotic arm

Title (de)

Maschine und Verfahren zur Sortierung verschiedener Gegenstände unter Verwendung zumindest eines Roboterarms

Title (fr)

Machine et procédé pour le tri d'objets divers à l'aide d'au moins un bras robotisé

Publication

EP 0706838 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95430008 A

Priority

FR 9412436 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0706838A1] The sorter consists of a conveyor (2) which carries the articles (E) to be sorted past a robot-controlled sorting post (3), where they are directed into appropriate containers (4). The sorting post comprises at least one robot arm (9) with a gripper (10), an artificial eye (8) which determines the position of articles on the belt and partially recognises their nature, and a complementary detection system (12) with one or more sensors to complete the identification of the articles. The data processing unit (15) processes the information from the artificial eye and sensors and causes the robot arm to pick up selected articles and drop them into the containers (4). The robot arm is of variable geometry, and the data processing unit has a computer which can recognise objects and their positions from the information provided and direct the arm to pick them up.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 5/342

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07C 5/342 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 5/126 (2013.01); B07C 5/3422 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0706838 A1 19960417; EP 0706838 B1 20000809; AT 195272 T 20000815; DE 69518293 D1 20000914; DE 69518293 T2 20010329; ES 2151587 T3 20010101; FR 2725640 A1 19960419; FR 2725640 B1 19970110

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-08 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENSES

- Name of requester: PELLENC SELECTIVE TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Effective date: 20120509

2005-10-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051011

2005-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031013

2004-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031011

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *PELLENC

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031013

2003-10-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031011

2003-10-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031011

2002-12-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021230

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20021127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021028

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021024

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20021023

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021015

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2001-06-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: PELLENC (SOCIETE ANONYME)

2001-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: PELLENC (SOCIETE ANONYME)

2001-01-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PELLENC (SOCIETE ANONYME)

2001-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151587 T3

2000-12-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2000-12-29 [REG CH PUEA] ASSIGNMENT OF THE SHARE

- Free text: S.I.T.A.;PELLENC (SOCIETE ANONYME) TRANSFER- PELLENC (SOCIETE ANONYME)

2000-11-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-11-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO TECNICO ING. A. MANNUCCI

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69518293 20000914

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195272 T 20000815

1998-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981021

1996-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960906

1996-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL