Global Patent Index - EP 0706882 B2

EP 0706882 B2 2001-01-17 - Sheet conveying drum for a printing machine

Title (en)

Sheet conveying drum for a printing machine

Title (de)

Bogenführender Trommelkörper für eine Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Tambour de transfert de feuilles pour une machine d'impression

Publication

EP 0706882 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 95116073 A

Priority

DE 4436955 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0706882A1] The drum is mounted between printing mechanisms or processing units. It has trunnions in bearings in side frames, and one or more grip bridges (6,7) at the periphery. The body of the drum (4) has two supporting discs (16) with concentric trunnions (15) working on a spindle (8) fixed to the frame. The discs are joined together via one or more rotary grip bridges (6,7). On the spindle inside the drum is an air-blast nozzle (9), adjacent to which is a pneumatically-operated sheet-guide (12). The nozzle can be connected to fans or an external air-supply system. Two supporting arms (17) can be fixed to the spindle and coupled together by the nozzle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/102 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0706882 A1 19960417; EP 0706882 B1 19971229; EP 0706882 B2 20010117; AT 161473 T 19980115; DE 4436955 A1 19960418; DE 4436955 C2 19991111

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2006-10-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061023

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051012

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-06-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021012

2003-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN A.G.

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021012

2002-10-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021012

2002-10-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021009

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-09-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020918

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011011

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-09-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010925

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-09-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010925

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-09-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010914

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-06-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2001-04-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-03-07 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2001-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2001-02-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2001-01-26 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-01-17 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1999-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT PLANETA-BOGENOFF

1998-11-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT PLANETA-BOGENOF

- Effective date: 19980928

1998-02-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59501163 19980205

1998-01-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19971229

1998-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1997-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1997-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1997-12-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 161473 T 19980115

1997-10-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1996-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961017

1996-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951026

1996-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL