Global Patent Index - EP 0706969 B1

EP 0706969 B1 2000-06-21 - Lift with a backpack mounted car on a frame

Title (en)

Lift with a backpack mounted car on a frame

Title (de)

Aufzug mit einem an einem Gestell rucksackgeführtem Fahrkorb

Title (fr)

Ascenseur avec cabine montée en sac-à-dos sur un châssis

Publication

EP 0706969 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95115252 A

Priority

DE 4436088 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0706969A2] The lift has a car (10), and a counterweight (15) which runs between the guide rails (7,8) for the car. The lift is suspended in a shaft (1) and driven by a cable system (25a,25b,26a,26b), with each cable having one end connected to the car, and the other end being secured in an upper region of the shaft. The counterweight has two coaxial pulleys (20,21), and a pair of pulleys with neighbouring parallel axles is mounted on an upper crossbeam (6) of the lift frame (4). Each pulley carries an equal number of cables, and the ends of the cables which support the car, are fixed symmetrically wrt. its central longitudinal plane, at the lateral ends of the car guide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/08; B66B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 9/04 (2006.01); B66B 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 9/04 (2013.01); B66B 11/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4436088 A1 19960411; DE 4436088 B4 20050616; AT 193997 T 20000715; CN 1053426 C 20000614; CN 1130149 A 19960904; EP 0706969 A2 19960417; EP 0706969 A3 19970108; EP 0706969 B1 20000621; ES 2148391 T3 20001016; GR 3034307 T3 20001229; PT 706969 E 20001229; US 5788017 A 19980804

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WITTUR A.G.

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040928

2005-09-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050927

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-05-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050328

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040927

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-04-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050405

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WITTUR A.G.

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-03-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050328

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040928

2004-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040928

2004-09-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040927

2004-09-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040927

2003-11-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031125

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030924

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-24 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030924

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030923

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030923

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030918

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030917

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030903

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000911

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148391 T3

2000-10-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000911

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PROPRIA S.R.L.

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508486 20000727

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193997 T 20000715

2000-06-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WITTUR AG

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990810

1997-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961218

1997-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

1996-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE