Global patent index - EP 0707057 B1

EP 0707057 B1 2000-01-12 - Carbon dioxide addition in hydrocracking/hydroisomerization processes to control methane production

Title (en)

Carbon dioxide addition in hydrocracking/hydroisomerization processes to control methane production

Title (de)

Addition von Kohlendioxid in Hydrokrack/Hydroisomerizierungsverfahren zur Kontrolierung der Methanherstellung

Title (fr)

Addition de gaz carbonique dans des procédés d'hydrocraquage/hydroisomérisation pour contrôler la production de méthane

Publication

EP 0707057 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95305724 A

Priority

US 29336294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0707057A1] Methane is suppressed in a hydroisomerization process without substantial effect on light gas and light liquid yields when carbon dioxide is included with the feed and a Group VIII non-noble metal or Group VI metal catalyst supported on alumina or silica-alumina.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 45/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 23/74 (2006.01); B01J 23/88 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 4/06 (2006.01); C07C 9/02 (2006.01); C10G 45/58 (2006.01); C10G 45/60 (2006.01); C10G 45/64 (2006.01); C10G 49/04 (2006.01); C10G 49/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 45/58 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0707057 A1 19960417; EP 0707057 B1 20000112; AU 3010795 A 19960229; AU 689286 B2 19980326; CA 2156212 A1 19960414; CA 2156212 C 20040106; DE 69514476 D1 20000217; DE 69514476 T2 20000824; JP 3671246 B2 20050713; JP H08176561 A 19960709; NO 311178 B1 20011022; NO 953255 A 19960220; NO 953255 D0 19950818

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050707

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-04-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20051011

2006-01-25 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20051011

2006-01-25 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free Format Text: 20051011

2005-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050804

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-07-12 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050712

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-07-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050707

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY

2001-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.

2001-01-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY

2000-12-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-03-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69514476

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1998-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980731

1996-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960923

1996-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL