Global Patent Index - EP 0707100 B1

EP 0707100 B1 2000-05-31 - Drafting apparatus in spinning machine

Title (en)

Drafting apparatus in spinning machine

Title (de)

Streckwerk in Spinnereimaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'étirage dans un métier à filer

Publication

EP 0707100 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95115980 A

Priority

JP 24562494 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0707100A2] The drafting apparatus in a spinning machine is provided with a top apron and a bottom apron, which are respectively wrapped around two pairs of drive rollers and tensors and are brought into contact with each other. An intermediate bottom roller engages the bottom apron. A weight roller engages the top apron to oppose the intermediate bottom roller and to press the top apron by its own weight toward the bottom apron. A cradle having a lateral face is located to support the top apron. A support shaft has a free end portion on which the weight roller is loosely fitted. The support shaft is cantilevered from the lateral face of the cradle. The weight roller is arranged to be removable in a direction away from the lateral face of the cradle. A restriction keeps the weight roller from shifting toward the free end of the support shaft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 5/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/86 (2006.01); D01H 5/26 (2006.01); D01H 5/88 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0707100 A2 19960417; EP 0707100 A3 19960821; EP 0707100 B1 20000531; BR 9504366 A 19970408; CN 1048047 C 20000105; CN 1129749 A 19960828; DE 69517278 D1 20000706; DE 69517278 T2 20010118; JP H08109526 A 19960430; KR 0137485 B1 19980515; TW 330594 U 19980421

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051010

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2002-11-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20021023

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517278 20000706

2000-06-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL S.A.

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1998-11-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980916

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1996-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951010

1996-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI