Global Patent Index - EP 0707114 B1

EP 0707114 B1 2001-04-11 - Structural component with a body molded from minerals

Title (en)

Structural component with a body molded from minerals

Title (de)

Bauteil mit einem Körper aus Mineralguss

Title (fr)

Elément de construction à corps de coulée en minéral

Publication

EP 0707114 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95115948 A

Priority

DE 4436460 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0707114A1] The component has a metal frame cast into the channel body and on at least one face-side end has a sprung-back arrangement. The frame consists of a roll-formed, double fold formed upper arm (13), a rib as locating surface and two lower arms (15,16). The lower arms form a channel (K) for accommodation of the material of the side walls (10) of the channel body and have through going tongues (19) directed inwardly to the channel. The channel body has a shrink chamber (18) in the area(s) of the sprung-back arrangement of the frame. The frame comprises an extrusion-pressed profile.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 11/22; E03F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 11/22 (2006.01); E03F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 11/227 (2013.01); E03F 3/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0707114 A1 19960417; EP 0707114 B1 20010411; AT 200531 T 20010415; DE 4436460 A1 19960425; DE 4436460 C2 19980610; DK 0707114 T3 20010507; ES 2158022 T3 20010901

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081229

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071011

2009-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071011

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071010

2006-10-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061025

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-10-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061024

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051010

2004-10-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041022

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-06-16 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-06-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ACO SEVERIN AHLMANN G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-04 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020104

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011026

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011023

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-22 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20011022

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158022 T3

2001-07-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509174 20010517

2001-05-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-05-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB LI NL

2001-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200531 T 20010415

2000-07-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000602

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961007

1996-09-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB LI NL

1996-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB LI NL