Global Patent Index - EP 0707121 B1

EP 0707121 B1 2000-03-22 - Panels for the manufacture of circular above-ground tanks, mould, and associated manufacturing method

Title (en)

Panels for the manufacture of circular above-ground tanks, mould, and associated manufacturing method

Title (de)

Panelen für die Herstellung oberirdischer Rundbehälter, Giessform und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Panneaux pour la construction de réservoirs circulaires au-dessus du sol, moule et procédé de construction

Publication

EP 0707121 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95115934 A

Priority

  • IT PC940020 A
  • IT PC950019 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0707121A1] Reinforced concrete panel for the manufacture of aboveground circular tanks, of the type comprising a wall (1) fitted with a number of horizontal stiffening ribs (3) which contain holes for the passage of pre-stressing cables, wherein the said wall is flat and the said holes are arc-shaped, and a method of manufacture of said panels comprising the following stages: insertion of a flexible tubular element (11), of the same length as an arc which presents a radius equal to the radius of the tank and a chord equal to the width of the panel, into a mould with mobile sides (8,9), on a pair of pegs (10) fitted to the sides at the horizontal ribs (3) of the panel; approach of the mobile sides (8,9) until the mould closes, so that the said flexible tubular element (11) takes on the arc shape required; installation of reinforcement and laying of concrete; concrete shaving; curing and removal of finished product. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 7/20; B28B 7/28; B28B 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/28 (2006.01); B28B 23/04 (2006.01); E04H 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 7/20 (2013.01); B28B 7/28 (2013.01); B28B 23/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0707121 A1 19960417; EP 0707121 B1 20000322; AT 191051 T 20000415; DE 69515780 D1 20000427; DE 69515780 T2 20000907; DK 0707121 T3 20000828; ES 2144086 T3 20000601; GR 3033437 T3 20000929; PT 707121 E 20000731

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141010

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121011

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131030

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140116

2012-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120410

2012-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-06-18 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20000401124

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-04-17 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20120410

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111111

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-03-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20101109

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PARENTI GIUSEPPE

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PARENTI CESARINO

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070910

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071004

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-08-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060801

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-06-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2002-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-10 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011010

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20001030

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-17 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20001017

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-09-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-08-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144086 T3

2000-05-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. MILANI GIORGIO

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515780 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19951010

2000-03-22 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191051 T 20000415

1997-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970618

1996-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961002

1996-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT

1996-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 951010

1996-04-17 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 951010