Global Patent Index - EP 0707128 B1

EP 0707128 B1 2000-11-08 - Roller blind with brake coupling

Title (en)

Roller blind with brake coupling

Title (de)

Kassettenrollo mit Bremskupplung

Title (fr)

Store enroulable avec embrayage-frein

Publication

EP 0707128 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95113071 A

Priority

DE 4436504 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4436504C1] The roller blind has a wt. strip at the lower end of the blind sheet and a drive. Coupling components with a winding shaft located in a cassette, complementary coupling components with a drive component and complementary coupling components are arranged on a statically fixable pin. The coupling components of the drive component and of the winding shaft, with a rotary movement of the drive component in the winding up direction of the blind sheet, come into counterpoised engagement with engagement and coupling components of the winding shaft and of the pin.On the winding shaft are provided coupling components comprising two concentrically interengaged casings (16, 18) rotatively movable against one another and loaded by a torsion spring (17) against the rotary direction of the drive component (6) when the blind sheet is wound up.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/78; E06B 9/40; E06B 9/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/42 (2006.01); E06B 9/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/42 (2013.01); E06B 9/68 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4436504 C1 19951102; CA 2158702 A1 19960414; EP 0707128 A1 19960417; EP 0707128 B1 20001108

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2015-05-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150301

2015-03-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150301

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130808

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130810

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-04-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES SWITZERLAND GMBH, CH

- Effective date: 20120312

2011-08-17 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110804

2011-08-17 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110804

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070819

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR IT NL

1997-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970807

1996-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960416

1996-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR IT NL