Global Patent Index - EP 0707434 B1

EP 0707434 B1 2001-01-03 - Radiator for motor vehicle heating system

Title (en)

Radiator for motor vehicle heating system

Title (de)

Heizkörper für eine Heizungsanlage eines Kraftfahrzeugs

Title (fr)

Radiateur pour système de chauffage d'un véhicule à moteur

Publication

EP 0707434 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95113221 A

Priority

DE 4436791 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0707434A2] The heating body has a vane/tube block through which air to be heated is passed and which has at least one row of tubes (6) arranged between the vanes (7) so as to conduct heat. At least some of the tubes are in the form of PTC heating tubes (8) with envelope tubes with integrated PTC heating elements. The heating power of the PTC heating elements and the dimensions of the vanes enclosing the associated envelope tubes are matched to the heat absorbing capacity of the air flowing through the vanes. Each second tube in the block can be replaced by an envelope tube with a PTC tube with PTC heating elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/14; H05B 3/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 3/04 (2006.01); H05B 3/14 (2006.01); H05B 3/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 3/0429 (2013.01); F24H 1/009 (2013.01); F24H 3/0405 (2013.01); F24H 3/0435 (2013.01); F24H 3/0447 (2013.01); F24H 3/085 (2013.01); F24H 9/1872 (2013.01); H05B 3/14 (2013.01); H05B 3/50 (2013.01); H05B 2203/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0707434 A2 19960417; EP 0707434 A3 19961204; EP 0707434 B1 20010103; EP 0707434 B2 20090506; DE 4436791 A1 19960418

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59508934

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2012-01-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59508934

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ANDREAS GRAUEL, DE

2012-01-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59508934

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GRAUEL, ANDREAS, DIPL.-PHYS. DR. RER. NAT., DE

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110907

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2011-09-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110819

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090823

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090823

2009-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20010824

2009-05-06 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20090506

2009-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-12-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BEHR GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FRITZ EICHENAUER GMBH & CO. KG FABRIK ELEKTRISCHER

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-03-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508934

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-08

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-01-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010103

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000629

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970112

1996-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1996-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE