Global Patent Index - EP 0707551 B9

EP 0707551 B9 2001-04-11 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INSERTING PARTITION ELEMENTS BETWEEN ARTICLES

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INSERTING PARTITION ELEMENTS BETWEEN ARTICLES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINFÜHREN VON FLACHEN TRENNELEMENTEN ZWISCHEN ARTIKELN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'INSERTION D'ELEMENTS ENTRE DES ARTICLES

Publication

EP 0707551 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 95916821 A

Priority

  • IB 9500365 W
  • IT BO940216 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5761882A] PCT No. PCT/IB95/00365 Sec. 371 Date Jan. 16, 1996 Sec. 102(e) Date Jan. 16, 1996 PCT Filed May 16, 1995 PCT Pub. No. WO95/31376 PCT Pub. Date Nov. 23, 1995Partition elements are inserted between articles of a group to be packaged and can extend in the longitudinal and/or transverse direction, by inserting the partitions from the bottom upwardly between longitudinal or transverse ranks of the articles by progressively spacing the ranks apart and bringing them together as the articles are transported along a transport path.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 61/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 61/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 61/207 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5761882 A 19980609; AU 2317795 A 19951205; DE 69519147 D1 20001123; DE 69519147 T2 20010510; EP 0707551 A1 19960424; EP 0707551 B1 20001018; EP 0707551 B9 20010411; ES 2153032 T3 20010216; IT BO940216 A1 19951116; IT BO940216 D0 19940516; WO 9531376 A1 19951123

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140515

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040517

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040516

2004-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040729

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-05-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040517

2004-05-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040516

2003-05-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030512

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-05-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030512

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-05-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030508

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2153032

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-12-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO P.I. GIUSEPPE MAZZONI

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69519147

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-23

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1996-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19961004

1996-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960313

1996-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT