Global Patent Index - EP 0707661 B1

EP 0707661 B1 2000-03-15 - METHOD OF LOW PRESSURE NITRIDING A METAL WORKPIECE AND OVEN FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD OF LOW PRESSURE NITRIDING A METAL WORKPIECE AND OVEN FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND OFEN ZUM NITRIEREN VON METALLISCHEN FORMTEILEN BEI NIEDRIGEN DRUCK

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA NITRURATION A BASSE PRESSION D'UNE PIECE METALLIQUE ET FOUR POUR LA MISE EN UVRE DUDIT PROCEDE

Publication

EP 0707661 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95918040 A

Priority

  • FR 9500522 W
  • FR 9405062 A
  • FR 9411483 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9529269A1] Metal workpieces undergo treatment at a temperature of approximately 500 DEG C - 600 DEG C in a low pressure atmosphere produced within an enclosure (1), with injection on the workpieces of a treatment gas composed of a gaseous mixture consisting of at least ammonia and a catalyst promoting the dissociation of ammonia in contact with said workpieces and opposing the recombination of the active nitrogen obtained from this dissociation into molecular nitrogen. According to the invention, bulk parts can be treated as well as complex-shaped workpieces such as tubular parts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 8/26; C23C 8/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/26 (2006.01); C23C 8/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/26 (2013.01); C23C 8/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9529269 A1 19951102; DE 69515588 D1 20000420; DE 69515588 T2 20000907; DE 707661 T1 19961010; EP 0707661 A1 19960424; EP 0707661 B1 20000315; TW 279902 B 19960701

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150420

2015-05-13 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150420

2015-04-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69515588

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515588 20000420

2000-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1997-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970619

1996-10-10 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1996-05-29 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1996-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951227

1996-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB