Global patent index - EP 0707675 B1

EP 0707675 B1 2001-03-28 - RAIL ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

RAIL ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

SCHIENENANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE RAIL

Publication

EP 0707675 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95917261 A

Priority

  • DE 9500563 W
  • DE 9407451 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9530796A1] The invention relates to a rail arrangement consisting of a rail, especially a grooved rail (2), an elastic rail base comprising a metal ribbed plate (15), a bed (17) and two intermediate layers (14, 16) of elastomeric material fitted between the rail foot and the ribbed plate or between the latter and the bed, two chambers on either side between the rail and the road surfacing (3), in which there is a filler section (4, 4') of elastomeric material in each chamber having, in particular, longitudinal grooves (6) and/or channels (5) and securing lips (7), and spaced rail clamps (12) on either side, which are in particular fitted with covers (13), in which, according to the invention, each filler section (4, 4') tapers in the region of the rail clamps (12) towards the rail foot forming a longitudinal groove (8) to accept the rail clamps (12) or covers (13), whereby a rail foot section (10) of elastomeric material is fitted in the groove between the rail clamps or covers. A further variant is proposed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 19/00; E01B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 19/003 (2013.01); E01B 2204/11 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29507028 U1 19950817; AT 200122 T 20010415; EP 0707675 A1 19960424; EP 0707675 B1 20010328; HU 217882 B 20000428; HU 9503645 D0 19960228; HU T74751 A 19970228; WO 9530796 A1 19951116

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150502

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-05-27 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20150502

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59509124

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141202

2014-12-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20141201

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59509124

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140529

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 200122

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130603

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010420

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59509124

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-03

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200122

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991104

1996-10-23 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBC

1996-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960110

1996-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL