Global Patent Index - EP 0707686 B1

EP 0707686 B1 2000-10-18 - HYDRAULIC GEARWHEEL MACHINE (PUMP OR ENGINE) IN PARTICULAR INTERNAL-GEARWHEEL MACHINE

Title (en)

HYDRAULIC GEARWHEEL MACHINE (PUMP OR ENGINE) IN PARTICULAR INTERNAL-GEARWHEEL MACHINE

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCHE ZAHNRADMASCHINE (PUMPE ODER MOTOR), INSBESONDERE INNENZAHNRADMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE HYDRAULIQUE A ROUES DENTEES (POMPE OU MOTEUR), NOTAMMENT MACHINE A ROUES DENTEES INTERIEURES

Publication

EP 0707686 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94924212 A

Priority

  • DE 4322240 A
  • EP 9402114 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5674060A] PCT No. PCT/EP94/02114 Sec. 371 Date Dec. 29, 1995 Sec. 102(e) Date Dec. 29, 1995 PCT Filed Jun. 29, 1994 PCT Pub. No. WO95/02125 PCT Pub. Date Jan. 19, 1995A hydraulic gear machine, in particular an internal gear machine having two gear wheels which mesh with each other in a chamber of a multipart housing, a sealing plate arranged on the side of the two gear wheels axially between them and a housing part, and a pressure field which is present in the housing part on the high-pressure side, is open towards the sealing plate, and is adapted to be acted on by high pressure. The order to provide embodiments of the gear machine which differ in their direction of rotation with the use of many of the same parts, a second pressure field is present in the housing part and the first pressure field is present only on the one side and the second pressure field only on the other side of a center plane which is defined by the axes of rotation of the two gear wheels so that a piece of the housing part is still present between the two pressure fields. Of the two pressure fields of a housing part, only the one pressure field can be acted on by high pressure in the specific counterclockwise or clockwise rotating embodiment. If the same housing part is used in the other embodiment, then the other pressure field is used for pressing the sealing plate against the gear wheels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/10 (2006.01); F04C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 15/0026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5674060 A 19971007; DE 4322240 A1 19950119; DE 4322240 C2 19970109; DE 4345273 C2 19970206; EP 0707686 A1 19960424; EP 0707686 B1 20001018; JP 3841823 B2 20061108; JP H09503261 A 19970331; WO 9502125 A1 19950119

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110629

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100624

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-04-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020629

2002-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020629

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010621

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010111

2001-01-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010118

2001-01-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010112

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-12-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT SE

1998-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980814

1998-01-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANNESMANN REXROTH AG

1996-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951123

1996-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT SE