Global Patent Index - EP 0707896 B1

EP 0707896 B1 2002-09-04 - Device for applying glue and its nozzle plate

Title (en)

Device for applying glue and its nozzle plate

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Auftragen von Leim oder dergleichen und dafür geeignete Düsenplatte

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'application de colle et plaque à buse pour le dispositif

Publication

EP 0707896 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95116217 A

Priority

  • DE 4437764 A
  • DE 29506334 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0707896A1] Strips of liquid such as glue are spread onto a flat surface via a head containing small-diameter outlets (29). The head and surface move in relation to each other. The glue etc. is delivered to the outlets under pressure. The outlets are contained in a common surface. They are contained in two or more rows (32,33) close together and one behind the other in the direction of relative movement (4). The distances between adjacent outlets are such that the strips emerging for them come into contact with each other along their side edges. Where there are three or more rows of outlets, these can run in oblique lines in the same direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0707896 A1 19960424; EP 0707896 B1 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-14 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59510359

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141029

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59510359 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ITW INDUSTRIE GMBH

1998-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980311

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961014

1996-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT