Global Patent Index - EP 0707906 B1

EP 0707906 B1 2001-01-24 - Automatic machine for the production of gaskets

Title (en)

Automatic machine for the production of gaskets

Title (de)

Automatische Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Dichtungen

Title (fr)

Machine automatique pour la fabrication de joints

Publication

EP 0707906 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94203075 A

Priority

EP 94203075 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0707906A1] An automatic machine for the production of gaskets (5) obtained by spiral winding of tapes (41, 51) of different physical and mechanical characteristics on a supporting ring (11), comprising means (13, 10) for feeding such supporting rings (11) to a mandrel (3), a unit (20) exerting radial pressure on such supporting rings (11), a unit (30) for welding one of such tapes (41) to ring (11), a unit (40) for feeding a tape (41) of high mechanical strength, a unit (50) for feeding a second tape (51) of sealing material and a unit (70) for controlling and synchronizing the feed to mandrel (3) of backing (41) and sealing (51) tapes interposed between respective feed units (40) and (50), there being furthermore provided means for the relative movement of feed unit (50) with respect to synchronizing unit (70) in a direction (Z-Z) transversal to direction (Y-Y) of feed of tapes (41, 51) to mandrel (3), as well as means for moving synchronizing unit (70) in a direction (X-X) normal to the other two directions (Y-Y; Z-Z) for the alignment of direction (Y-Y) of feed of tapes (41, 51) at a tangent to the preset circumference of the gasket, and means (81, 83) for maintaining such alignment as the outside diameter of the gasket increases. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 53/00; B21D 53/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0707906 A1 19960424; EP 0707906 B1 20010124; DE 69426628 D1 20010301

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011022

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011022

2001-07-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-06-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-04-25 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69426628 20010301

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-01-24 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-01-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-01-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-05-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000405

1996-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960807

1996-08-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1996-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL