Global patent index - EP 0707927 B1

EP 0707927 B1 2000-01-26 - Cutting device having a motor

Title (en)

Cutting device having a motor

Title (de)

Abschneidevorrichtung mit Motor

Title (fr)

Dispositif de coupe à moteur

Publication

EP 0707927 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95116455 A

Priority

DE 9416958 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0707927A1] The sliding knife (14) works in bearings at its side edges, and acts only via its cutting edge (15) against that of the fixed knife, (16), so forming a three-point mounting for the sliding one. The latter is driven via two points (13,13a) situated symmetrically in relation to its centre line. Each knife bearing can be formed by a notch containing bearing balls. Alternatively it can consist of a slide shoe with spring guide member working against the knife. A stop can be provided, working with the guide member.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 1/08; B26D 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/08 (2006.01); B26D 3/12 (2006.01); B26D 5/08 (2006.01); B26D 7/00 (2006.01); B41J 11/70 (2006.01); G07B 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/086 (2013.01); B26D 1/085 (2013.01); B26D 3/12 (2013.01); B26D 5/08 (2013.01); B26D 7/0006 (2013.01); B41J 11/703 (2013.01); G07B 5/02 (2013.01); Y10T 83/8843 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8848 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8853 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8854 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8881 (2015.04)

Citation (examination)

WO 9426478 A1 19941124 - SIEMENS NIXDORF INF SYST [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 9416958 U1 19950216; EP 0707927 A1 19960424; EP 0707927 B1 20000126; ES 2145201 T3 20000701; US 6148708 A 20001121

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151020

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151018

2016-01-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160126

2015-11-11 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20151018

2015-10-21 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK

- Effective date: 20151018

2015-10-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59507688

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141023

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141014

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2145201

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59507688

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-02

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1998-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980407

1996-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960921

1996-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL