Global Patent Index - EP 0708008 B1

EP 0708008 B1 2000-05-31 - Detachable grip of a chairlift or a cable car

Title (en)

Detachable grip of a chairlift or a cable car

Title (de)

Kuppelklemme eines Sessellifts oder einer Kabinenseilbahn

Title (fr)

Pince débrayable d'un télésiège ou d'une télécabine

Publication

EP 0708008 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95410098 A

Priority

FR 9410936 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JPH0885448A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To reduce the size of grip devices and eliminate problem icing of their movable portions by constructing heavily loaded jaws, a hanger, a support bar and the lower ends of compression springs in a block. SOLUTION: A support hanger 12 movable along a moving cable 9 in a cableway carrier system supports by way of its joint 11 a grip body 10 that carries cable clamping jaws comprising a fixed jaw 13 and a movable jaw 14 and giving clamping force from a pair of compression springs 28 and 29. The clamping jaws are controlled in opening/closing relative to the cable 9 by a grip operating mechanism including an operating lever 17. One-side ends 30 and 31 of the compression springs 28 and 29 are secured to the free end of the operating lever 17, and the other ends 33 and 34 are near the fixed jaw 13. The compression springs 28 and 29 extend in a second plane perpendicular to a first plane the grip body 10 and operating lever 17 define and slanting relative to the grip body 10.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 12/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/122 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2724357 A1 19960315; FR 2724357 B1 19970124; AT 193499 T 20000615; CA 2156218 A1 19960309; CA 2156218 C 20050329; EP 0708008 A1 19960424; EP 0708008 B1 20000531; ES 2146727 T3 20000816; JP H0885448 A 19960402; US 5568771 A 19961029

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050908

2006-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050908

2005-09-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-09-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050907

2004-09-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040929

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040915

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040913

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146727 T3

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES IT LI

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: INTERPATENT ST.TECN. BREV.

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193499 T 20000615

1997-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970807

1996-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960904

1996-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES IT LI