Global Patent Index - EP 0708169 B1

EP 0708169 B1 2002-11-20 - The use of a composition containing rapeseed oil ester and a natural oil as lubricating or maintenance agent for rubber

Title (en)

The use of a composition containing rapeseed oil ester and a natural oil as lubricating or maintenance agent for rubber

Title (de)

Die Verwendung einer Zusammensetzung enthaltend Rapsölester und ein natives Öl als Gleit- oder Pflegemittel für Gummi

Title (fr)

L'Utilisation d'un compositioon contenant d'ester d'huile de colza et d'huile naturelle comme agent de lubrification ou d'entretien pour caoutshouc

Publication

EP 0708169 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95112645 A

Priority

DE 4437880 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0708169A2] Compsns. referred to as lubricant or care agents, esp. useful for care (cleaning and protection) of rubber, contain synthetic ester oils and natural oils.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 101/04; C08J 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 111/02 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/048 (2013.01); C10M 101/04 (2013.01); C10M 105/34 (2013.01); C10M 111/02 (2013.01); C10M 129/06 (2013.01); C10M 131/12 (2013.01); C10M 147/02 (2013.01); C10M 155/02 (2013.01); C10M 159/06 (2013.01); C10M 2205/14 (2013.01); C10M 2205/16 (2013.01); C10M 2205/17 (2013.01); C10M 2205/18 (2013.01); C10M 2207/021 (2013.01); C10M 2207/281 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2815 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/283 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2845 (2013.01); C10M 2207/286 (2013.01); C10M 2207/40 (2013.01); C10M 2207/401 (2013.01); C10M 2207/404 (2013.01); C10M 2207/4045 (2013.01); C10M 2211/044 (2013.01); C10M 2211/06 (2013.01); C10M 2213/02 (2013.01); C10M 2213/062 (2013.01); C10M 2229/02 (2013.01); C10M 2229/04 (2013.01); C10M 2229/041 (2013.01); C10M 2229/042 (2013.01); C10M 2229/043 (2013.01); C10M 2229/044 (2013.01); C10M 2229/045 (2013.01); C10M 2229/046 (2013.01); C10M 2229/047 (2013.01); C10M 2229/048 (2013.01); C10M 2229/05 (2013.01); C10M 2229/051 (2013.01); C10M 2229/052 (2013.01); C10M 2229/053 (2013.01); C10M 2229/054 (2013.01); C10N 2240/00 (2013.01); C10N 2240/22 (2013.01); C10N 2240/30 (2013.01); C10N 2240/50 (2013.01); C10N 2240/52 (2013.01); C10N 2240/54 (2013.01); C10N 2240/56 (2013.01); C10N 2240/58 (2013.01); C10N 2240/60 (2013.01); C10N 2240/66 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0708169 A2 19960424; EP 0708169 A3 19960515; EP 0708169 B1 20021120; AT 228160 T 20021215; DE 4437880 A1 19960425; DE 4437880 C2 19960829

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050811

2004-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040824

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040824

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CARAMBA CHEMIE G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-09-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-11 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030811

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-02-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, KAMINSKI & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE ESTABLI

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59510464 20030102

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR LI LU NL

2002-11-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228160 T 20021215

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 10M 101/04 A, 7C 08J 7/06 B, 7C 10M 101/04 J, 7C 10M 101:04 J, 7C 10N 40:00 Z

2002-01-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: THE USE OF A COMPOSITION CONTAINING RAPESEED OIL ESTER AND A NATURAL OIL AS LUBRICATING OR MAINTENANCE AGENT FOR RUBBER

2001-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARAMBA CHEMIE GMBH & CO. KG

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990115

1996-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR LI LU NL

1996-05-01 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M101/04

1996-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950818

1996-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR LI LU NL