Global Patent Index - EP 0708203 B1

EP 0708203 B1 2000-12-20 - Device and method for humidifying a moving web material

Title (en)

Device and method for humidifying a moving web material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Befeuchten einer vorbeilaufenden Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode pour humidifier une bande de matériau en mouvement

Publication

EP 0708203 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95113744 A

Priority

DE 4437375 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0708203A2] A moistening appts. for a running web of material has a chamber with a surface where steam exits treat the web facing it and a front facing against the web run at the end of the treatment surface. Here, a strip (15), placed before said surface (8), esp. at the chamber front (9) and projecting, at least partially over strip length, to the web over the surface, has an edge (17) facing the oncoming web (2). Also claimed is a process using the appts. where at least one steam jet is directed at the web and where, here, the air layer adhering to the web is at least partially stirred about or stripped off before steam application. Pref. the strip is arranged to have an adjustable spacing between the web and the chamber edge which also is adjustable in a curve across the web. The spacing width (A), following web curvature, is constant over the web breadth and is between 2 and 12 mm. The strip, formed from at least two layers placed together, has slits which travel from the edge opposite the steam-side edge (17), end in holes of dia. greater than slit widths, the slits of one layer being displaced from those of the other. One layer, being heated on the chamber, lies flat and is made from heat-conducting material at least equivalent to copper. The strip has elongated holes to take bolts inserted from the chamber front to attach the two layers at pre-set points where between any two is placed a slit from each layer. The air layer is stripped off just before the gap through which steam is blown. Alternatively the strip is bent at an angle facing against web run at angle, alpha, between 30 and 70 degrees .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 7/00; D21G 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 7/00 (2006.01); D21G 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 7/00 (2013.01); D21F 7/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0708203 A2 19960424; EP 0708203 A3 19970115; EP 0708203 B1 20001220; AT 198223 T 20010115; CA 2157311 A1 19960420; CA 2157311 C 19990511; DE 4437375 A1 19960425; DE 4437375 C2 20000525; US 5778559 A 19980714; US 5946821 A 19990907

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-06-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060907

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070902

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060907

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070829

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT FR GB IT SE

2000-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198223 T 20010115

2000-04-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HUMIDIFYING A MOVING WEB MATERIAL

1998-09-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980716

1997-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970130

1997-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT FR GB IT SE

1996-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT FR GB IT SE