Global Patent Index - EP 0708330 B1

EP 0708330 B1 2002-09-11 - Low voltage miniaturized column analytical apparatus and method

Title (en)

Low voltage miniaturized column analytical apparatus and method

Title (de)

Analytisches miniaturisiertes Niederspannungssaülengerät und Verfahren

Title (fr)

Appareil d'analyse à colonne, miniaturisé, à basse tension, et procédé

Publication

EP 0708330 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95116504 A

Priority

  • US 32611194 A
  • US 48321795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0708330A1] A miniaturized column analytical apparatus (2) having a miniaturized column device (5) containing a body (4) with an elongate separation compartment (8) is provided. Two or more sets of spaced apart antennas (12A, 12B, 12C, etc.) are positioned along the elongate separation compartment. The elongate separation compartment has first and second opposing sides (10A, 10B) along its elongate dimension. Each set of antenna contains a plurality of antennas. One antenna from each set is associated with at least one antenna from each of the other sets to form repeating sequences of antennas along the separation compartment on the opposing sides of the separation compartment. Each set of the antennas is associated with a different oscillating electrical potential to provide a plurality of oscillating electric fields along the elongate separation compartment to draw a target substance along the elongate separation compartment toward an exit end of the separation compartment. The detector (3) can detect a target substance passing out of the elongate separation compartment. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 27/447

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01L 7/00 (2006.01); B81C 1/00 (2006.01); G01N 27/447 (2006.01); G01N 30/60 (2006.01); B81B 1/00 (2006.01); G01N 30/02 (2006.01); G01N 30/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 30/6095 (2013.01); B01L 7/54 (2013.01); G01N 27/44773 (2013.01); G01N 27/44791 (2013.01); B01L 2400/0415 (2013.01); B29C 66/549 (2013.01); G01N 27/44721 (2013.01); G01N 30/02 (2013.01); G01N 30/60 (2013.01); G01N 30/6052 (2013.01); G01N 30/606 (2013.01); G01N 2030/285 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. G01N 30/02 + G01N 2030/0035
  2. B29C 66/549 + B29C 65/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0708330 A1 19960424; EP 0708330 B1 20020911; DE 69528130 D1 20021017; DE 69528130 T2 20030515

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081019

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081019

2009-05-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081016

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071020

2008-06-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071030

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-10-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061027

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69528130 20021017

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2001-08-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000530

1996-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960730

1996-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI SE