Global Patent Index - EP 0708378 B1

EP 0708378 B1 2000-12-13 - Two-component type developer, developing method and image forming method

Title (en)

Two-component type developer, developing method and image forming method

Title (de)

Entwickler des Zweikomponententyps, Entwicklungsverfahren und Bildherstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Révélateur du type à deux composants, procédé de développement et procédé de formation d'image

Publication

EP 0708378 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95306880 A

Priority

JP 26442894 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0708378A2] A two-component type developer for developing an electrostatic image is constituted by at least a toner and a magnetic carrier. The toner has a weight-average particle size D4 of at most 10 mu m and a number-average particle size D1 satisfying D4/D1 </= 1.5. The magnetic carrier comprises composite particles comprising magnetic iron compound particles, non-magnetic metal oxide particles, and a binder comprising a phenolic resin. The composite particles contain the magnetic iron compound and the non-magnetic metal oxide in a total proportion of 80 - 99 wt. %. The magnetic iron compound particles have a number-average particle size ra, and the non-magnetic metal oxide particles have a number-average particle size rb satisfying rb/ra > 1.0.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 9/107; G03G 9/08; G03G 9/10; G03G 9/113

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 9/08 (2006.01); G03G 9/10 (2006.01); G03G 9/107 (2006.01); G03G 13/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 9/0819 (2013.01); G03G 9/10 (2013.01); G03G 9/107 (2013.01); G03G 9/1075 (2013.01); G03G 13/09 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0708378 A2 19960424; EP 0708378 A3 19960501; EP 0708378 B1 20001213; CN 1099054 C 20030115; CN 1130767 A 19960911; DE 69519620 D1 20010118; DE 69519620 T2 20010517; HK 1014051 A1 20010817; KR 0163996 B1 19990320

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140929

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140929

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69519620

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140929

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69519620

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130903

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130924

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130930

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69519620

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-18

2001-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-03-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980115

1996-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960911

1996-05-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-05-01 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RHK1

- IPC: G03G 9/107

1996-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT